+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 85 NOES: 66
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor