+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SS AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Reported to the House with... - SS
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 10:30am or upon morning recess, SCR 1
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Health and Pensions
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor