+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor