+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 123 NOES: 29
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED TO RECONSIDER/VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor