+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor