+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 10
- House Adopts - SS ADOPTED AYES: 135 NOES: 10
- Taken Up
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 31
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 28, 2014, 8:30pm, Senate Lounge
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 24
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted - ha 1, ha 2 adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (8)
4510H02.31H
Distributed
4510H02.28H
Distributed
4510H02.30H
Distributed
4510H02.27H
Distributed
4510H02.26H
Adopted
4510H02.24H
Distributed
4510H02.22H
Adopted
4510H02.14H
Distributed