+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 14, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 149 NOES: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 143 NOES: 4
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, MAY 2, 2011, 2:45PM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS/SCS, SA 1 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted - SA 2 ADOPTED
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 20, 2011, 1:30PM, SCR 1
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Government Accountability &Fisc Oversght
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 1
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor