+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor