+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 19, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled