+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor