+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, March 17, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Lounge
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, March 10, 2016 , 8:30am, Senate Lounge
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4897H02.01H
Distributed
4897H01.03H
Distributed
+ − Vote
February 3, 2016: HB 1366
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor