+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor