+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 8:30AM, SCR 1
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 3
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor