+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED/SS PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 2:45PM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM, EXECUTIVE SESSION ONLY ON HCS HB 1361
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
- Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor