+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 3
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time