+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor