+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor