+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time