+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- 4/30/2012
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: Urban Issues
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor