+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
5200L01.01L
Distributed
5200L01.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor