+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Action Postponed
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
T. Muschany
Type:
Primary Sponsor