+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - NO ACTION TAKEN
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time