+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 5, 2006-1:00PM-SENATE LOUNGE
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 13
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor