+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 15 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor