+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- House Message
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 121 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SCS as amended AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On May 8, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Reported to the House with... - SCS as amended
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 27 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- SCS Adopted
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (11)
3074S02.03S
Adopted
3074S02.01S
Adopted
8105S20.01S
Moot
3074S02.01F
Distributed
3074S.03F
Withdrawn
3074H01.12H
Defeated
3074H01.10H
Adopted
3074H01.06H
Adopted
3074H01.05H
Distributed
3074H01.02H
Distributed
3074H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor