+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 9, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 PRESENT: 1
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Introduced and Read First Time