+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 adopted/SA 5 to SS for SCS pending
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 7, 2018, 10:15am, SCR 1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 6
- Taken Up
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to retirement benefits for public employees
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (8)
4966S03.01S
Offered
4966S03.03S
Adopted
4966S03.10S
Adopted
4966S03.08S
Adopted
4966S03.04S
Adopted
4966S.03F
Offered
4966H01.02H
Adopted
4966H01.01H
Adopted