+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor