+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- 3/11/2004
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time