+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 10, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 000
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 000
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 01
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 8, 2012, 9:00 A.M., SCR 1
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 0
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HSA 1 FOR HA 3 ADOPTED
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time