+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 5, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 128 NOES: 000
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 000
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Was Dissolved
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6 ADOPTED AYES: 29 NAYS: 02
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - KEHOE, MUNZLINGER, RICHARD, MCKENNA, CHAPPELLE-NADAL
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 2:00PM, SCR 2
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 26, 9:00AM, SCR 1
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 000
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor