+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled