+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 1
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (90)
Type:
Primary Sponsor