+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time