+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 139 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 4
- House Message
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 1
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 7, 2014, Noon or upon noon recess, Senate Lounge
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 3
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
4703H02.01H
Distributed
4703H02.02H
Distributed