+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Renewable Energy
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor