+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 8
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time