+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 1:00 p.m., Monday, April 27, 2020, Senate Chamber
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled