+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
3421H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor