+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 3
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 150 NOES: 4
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 7
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Policy
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor