+ − Actions (22)
On June 8, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On April 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 00
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 005
On March 5, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 13, 2000 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor