+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Commerce and Environment
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 13
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor