+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled