+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor