+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 4
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor