+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 083 NOES: 065
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Urban Issues
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor