+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor