+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 86 NOES: 67
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection - AYES: 074 NOES: 070
- Laid Over - HA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor