+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time