+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time